This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 23:06:21 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS RAMIREZ, JERONIMO Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAMIREZ, JERONIMO. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

RAMIREZ-ROMERO, MARCO A

RAMIREZ, JERONIMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

JACOBSON, STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018111762)

8/21/2018: JUDGMENT - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018111762)

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS & INTEREST

8/9/2018: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS & INTEREST

AFFIDAVIT - DAMAGES

8/9/2018: AFFIDAVIT - DAMAGES

MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

8/9/2018: MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO & JERONIMO RAMIREZ

4/19/2018: DEFAULT - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO & JERONIMO RAMIREZ

NOTICE OF FILING - NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT (EFILED AND ACCEPTED IN WRONG CASE)

4/18/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT (EFILED AND ACCEPTED IN WRONG CASE)

AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

4/18/2018: AFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO AND JERONIMO RAMIREZ

4/18/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO AND JERONIMO RAMIREZ

SUMMONS SERVED - JERONIMO RAMIREZ

3/13/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - JERONIMO RAMIREZ

SUMMONS SERVED - JERONIMO RAMIERZ

3/12/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - JERONIMO RAMIERZ

SUMMONS SERVED - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO

3/12/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO

PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2018002828

1/9/2018: PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2018002828

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JERONIMO RAMIREZ - ISSUED 01/09/2018

1/9/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JERONIMO RAMIREZ - ISSUED 01/09/2018

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- MARCO A RAMIREZ ROMERO - ISSUED 01/09/2018

1/9/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- MARCO A RAMIREZ ROMERO - ISSUED 01/09/2018

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/9/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

1/9/2018: COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018111762)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS & INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO & JERONIMO RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT (EFILED AND ACCEPTED IN WRONG CASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO AND JERONIMO RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JERONIMO RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JERONIMO RAMIERZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MARCO A RAMIREZ-ROMERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$320.00; Amount Paid:$320.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2018002828

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JERONIMO RAMIREZ - ISSUED 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- MARCO A RAMIREZ ROMERO - ISSUED 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less