This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/01/2022 at 18:38:53 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 9 LLC VS WAINWRIGHT, COREY

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 9 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WAINWRIGHT, COREY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 9 LLC

Defendant

WAINWRIGHT, COREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK, ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/6/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -COREY WAINWRIGHT - ISSUED 11/7/2022

11/6/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -COREY WAINWRIGHT - ISSUED 11/7/2022

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

11/6/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022099142

11/7/2022: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022099142

SUMMONS SERVED - COREY WAINWRIGHT - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

11/17/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - COREY WAINWRIGHT - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

ANSWER: COREY WAINWRIGHT

11/22/2022: ANSWER: COREY WAINWRIGHT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - COREY WAINRIGHT

11/30/2022: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - COREY WAINRIGHT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION - COREY WAINRIGHT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketACTION: COPY OF ANSWER TO JUDICIAL ASSISTANT FOR JUDGE GALEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER: COREY WAINWRIGHT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - COREY WAINWRIGHT - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $195.00; Amount Paid: $195.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2022099142

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE -COREY WAINWRIGHT - ISSUED 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK