This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 17:00:30 (UTC).

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 9 LLC VS DAYTON, SEAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 9 LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAYTON, SEAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 9 LLC

Defendants

HUGHES, GAYLA

DAYTON, SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK, ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS FAMILY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GAYLA HUGHES - ISSUED 8/12/22

8/12/2022: SUMMONS FAMILY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GAYLA HUGHES - ISSUED 8/12/22

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SEAN DAYTON - ISSUED 8/12/22

8/12/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SEAN DAYTON - ISSUED 8/12/22

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

8/12/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2022072150

8/12/2022: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2022072150

RESPONSE - TO EVICTION NOTICE - SEAN DAYTON AND GAYLA DAYTON

8/23/2022: RESPONSE - TO EVICTION NOTICE - SEAN DAYTON AND GAYLA DAYTON

PAYMENT $1,200.12 RECEIPT #2022076837

8/26/2022: PAYMENT $1,200.12 RECEIPT #2022076837

SUMMONS SERVED - SEAN DAYTON

8/30/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - SEAN DAYTON

SUMMONS SERVED - GAYLA HUGHES

8/30/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - GAYLA HUGHES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GAYLA HUGHES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SEAN DAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $1,200.12 RECEIPT #2022076837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketACTION: SENT RESPONSE TO JUDGE GALEN OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO EVICTION NOTICE - SEAN DAYTON AND GAYLA DAYTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $1,405.12; Amount Paid: $1,405.12; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION; Total Fee: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CLERK FEE; Total Fee: $25.12; Amount Paid: $25.12; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: REGISTRY DEPOSIT; Total Fee: $1,175.00; Amount Paid: $1,175.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2022072150

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SEAN DAYTON - ISSUED 8/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS FAMILY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- GAYLA HUGHES - ISSUED 8/12/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESS RESIDENTIAL BORROWER 5 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK