This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/11/2021 at 14:31:58 (UTC).

PREMIER SOTHEBYS INTERNATIONAL REALTY VS JOSEPH MARIANI AS FORMER MANAGING MEMBER OF MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2015 PREMIER SOTHEBYS INTERNATIONAL REALTY filed an Other lawsuit against JOSEPH MARIANI AS FORMER MANAGING MEMBER OF MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MERCURIO, FREDERICK P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREMIER SOTHEBYS INTERNATIONAL REALTY

Defendants

JOSEPH MARIANI AS FORMER MANAGING MEMBER OF MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEWART, JESSICA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/3/2015: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/3/2015: COMPLAINT - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2015013034

2/3/2015: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2015013034

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOSEPH MARIANI AS FORMER MANAGING MEMBER OF MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP- ISSUED 3/30/15

3/30/2015: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOSEPH MARIANI AS FORMER MANAGING MEMBER OF MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP- ISSUED 3/30/15

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP- ISSUED 3/30/15

3/30/2015: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP- ISSUED 3/30/15

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2015036802

3/30/2015: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2015036802

SUMMONS SERVED - JOSEPH MARIANI

5/18/2015: SUMMONS SERVED - JOSEPH MARIANI

SUMMONS NON SERVED - MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

6/11/2015: SUMMONS NON SERVED - MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER FLA.R.CIV.P.1.420(E)

8/25/2017: MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER FLA.R.CIV.P.1.420(E)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

9/12/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/14/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2017
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 11/14/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 7C , JDG: MERCURIO, FREDERICK P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER FLA.R.CIV.P.1.420(E)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - JOSEPH MARIANI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2015036802

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP- ISSUED 3/30/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOSEPH MARIANI AS FORMER MANAGING MEMBER OF MARIANI FAMILY REAL ESTATE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP- ISSUED 3/30/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2015013034

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less