This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 06/25/2021 at 21:01:11 (UTC).

POZDOL, EDNA E, POZDOL, EDNA ELOISE Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 POZDOL, EDNA E, POZDOL, EDNA ELOISE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Decedents

POZDOL, EDNA ELOISE

POZDOL, EDNA E

Applicant

SHERIDAN, BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

HINES, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2021108620)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PRIVATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021044597

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PRIVATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FLORIDA TAX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT HINES