This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 10:34:03 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS STEELE, GREGORY K

Case Summary

On 03/19/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEELE, GREGORY K. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

STEELE, GREGORY K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

10/25/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/2/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS NON SERVED - GREGORY K STEELE

9/13/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - GREGORY K STEELE

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018084881

8/20/2018: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018084881

SUMMONS ISSUED - ALIAS - GREGORY K STEELE

8/20/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - ALIAS - GREGORY K STEELE

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GREGORY K STEELE

8/20/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GREGORY K STEELE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4/17/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS NON SERVED - GREGORY K STEELE

4/13/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - GREGORY K STEELE

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GREGORY K STEELE

3/20/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GREGORY K STEELE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2018028821

3/19/2018: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2018028821

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GREGORY K STEELE

3/19/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GREGORY K STEELE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/19/2018: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

3/19/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - GREGORY K STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2018084881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - ALIAS - GREGORY K STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 10/02/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - GREGORY K STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - GREGORY K STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GREGORY K STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 04/17/2018 AT 9:00 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$195.00; Amount Paid:$195.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2018028821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - GREGORY K STEELE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less