This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/19/2021 at 20:23:05 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS PERALTA, CARLA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PERALTA, CARLA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

PERALTA, CARLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON

Defendant Attorney

RUBIN, ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

8/16/2019: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE - SETTLEMENT

6/19/2019: NOTICE - SETTLEMENT

MOTION - TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND FOR THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

5/30/2019: MOTION - TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND FOR THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/29/2019: RESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF FILING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

5/29/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF

3/16/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE - DEFENDANTS OFFER OF JUDGMENT

3/16/2019: NOTICE - DEFENDANTS OFFER OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM

3/15/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM

RESPONSE - ADMISSIONS REQUEST

3/15/2019: RESPONSE - ADMISSIONS REQUEST

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/19/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/19/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION - DISMISS

2/19/2019: MOTION - DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2/18/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS SERVED - CARLA PERALTA

2/11/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - CARLA PERALTA

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019011666

2/1/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019011666

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CARLA PERALTA ISSUED 2/1/2019

2/1/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CARLA PERALTA ISSUED 2/1/2019

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

2/1/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND FOR THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - DEFENDANTS OFFER OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - ADMISSIONS REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CARLA PERALTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019011666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CARLA PERALTA ISSUED 2/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less