This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/05/2021 at 18:07:24 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS NARDELLA, VINCENT T

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NARDELLA, VINCENT T. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

NARDELLA, VINCENT T

Nokomis, FL 34275-3540

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

8/16/2021: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/11/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS NON SERVED - VINCENT T NARDELLA

8/9/2021: SUMMONS NON SERVED - VINCENT T NARDELLA

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - VINCENT T NARDELLA

7/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - VINCENT T NARDELLA

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

7/7/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021057780

7/7/2021: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021057780

NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

7/2/2021: NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

7/2/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

7/2/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/2/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - VINCENT T NARDELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - VINCENT T NARDELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/11/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021057780

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ