This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 17:35:53 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS GUIDO, KELLY

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUIDO, KELLY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

GUIDO, KELLY

Englewood, FL 34223-3456

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/13/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

1/13/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

1/13/2023: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

1/13/2023: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023004242

1/13/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023004242

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KELLY GUIDO

1/17/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KELLY GUIDO

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM F; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KELLY GUIDO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 02/15/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN F , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023004242

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less