This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 03:05:12 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS FREDDOLINO, DARCIE J

Case Summary

On 02/11/2014 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FREDDOLINO, DARCIE J. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

FREDDOLINO, DARCIE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONDER, CHANTEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DARCIE J FREDDOLINO- ISSUED 2/11/2014

2/11/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DARCIE J FREDDOLINO- ISSUED 2/11/2014

COMPLAINT

2/11/2014: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/11/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

EXHIBIT B - STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT

2/11/2014: EXHIBIT B - STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT

AFFIDAVIT - FOR CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

2/11/2014: AFFIDAVIT - FOR CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016701

2/11/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016701

ANSWER - DEFENDANT DARCIE J FREDDOLINO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT - DARCIE J FREDDOLINO

3/5/2014: ANSWER - DEFENDANT DARCIE J FREDDOLINO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT - DARCIE J FREDDOLINO

VERIFIED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/4/2014: VERIFIED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT -IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -DARCIE J FREDDOLINO

6/27/2014: AFFIDAVIT -IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -DARCIE J FREDDOLINO

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/27/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/29/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/30/2015: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MOTION TO REFER TO ARBITRATION

7/30/2015: MOTION TO REFER TO ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

8/28/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/7/2015: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

3/22/2016: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • HearingTime:02:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Oct 7 2015 2:30PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • HearingTime:03:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO REFER TO ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 30 2015 3:00PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - DEFENDANT DARCIE J FREDDOLINO'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT - DARCIE J FREDDOLINO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016701

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - FOR CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT B - STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DARCIE J FREDDOLINO- ISSUED 2/11/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/11/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000789 SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONDER, CHANTEL