This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/05/2021 at 18:07:10 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS DOVGOPOLYI, OKSANA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOVGOPOLYI, OKSANA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

DOVGOPOLYI, OKSANA

Osprey, FL 34229-6830

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

8/25/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

SUMMONS SERVED - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

8/24/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

8/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

AFFIDAVIT - INDEBTEDNESS

8/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT - INDEBTEDNESS

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

8/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

8/24/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

8/24/2021: MOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

8/4/2021: ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/3/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

7/19/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

7/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

7/7/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

7/2/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021057777

7/7/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021057777

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/2/2021: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

7/2/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/2/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - OKSANA DOVGOPOLYI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/03/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021057777

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ