This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 03:06:13 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS CHISHOLM, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 02/11/2014 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHISHOLM, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

CHISHOLM, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONDER, CHANTEL

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016697

2/11/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016697

COMPLAINT

2/11/2014: COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM

6/12/2014: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM- ISSUED 2/11/2014

2/11/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM- ISSUED 2/11/2014

FACT INFORMATION SHEET - NOT COMPLETED

3/18/2015: FACT INFORMATION SHEET - NOT COMPLETED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/11/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS SERVED - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM

3/18/2015: SUMMONS SERVED - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

6/12/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016020126)

2/22/2016: JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016020126)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION ;Court Result:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2016020126)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 04/06/2016 AT 11:00 AM IN H , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFACT INFORMATION SHEET - NOT COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014016697

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT B - STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - TIMOTHY CHISHOLM- ISSUED 2/11/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - FROM CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/11/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000788 SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONDER, CHANTEL