This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 18:31:40 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS BOUKNIGHT, TIMOTHY P

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOUKNIGHT, TIMOTHY P. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

BOUKNIGHT, TIMOTHY P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORNARO, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

7/16/2020: SUMMONS SERVED - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

7/10/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020054491

7/10/2020: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020054491

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/10/2020: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

7/10/2020: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

7/10/2020: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/10/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/18/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020054491

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - TIMOTHY P BOUKNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less