This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/27/2021 at 13:38:19 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS BOOKER, LYNDA

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BOOKER, LYNDA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

BOOKER, LYNDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONDER, CHANTEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LYNDA BOOKER - ISSUED

1/14/2014: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LYNDA BOOKER - ISSUED

EXHIBIT B

1/14/2014: EXHIBIT B

AFFIDAVIT - CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

1/14/2014: AFFIDAVIT - CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/14/2014: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/14/2014: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014005065

1/14/2014: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014005065

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS - LYNDA BOOKER

2/12/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS - LYNDA BOOKER

PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2014017056

2/12/2014: PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2014017056

PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2014017060

2/12/2014: PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2014017060

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/25/2014: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/27/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/29/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/30/2015: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

7/30/2015: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2015
  • HearingTime:03:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jul 30 2015 3:00PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • HearingTime:02:15 PM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 9 2015 2:15PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 9 2015 2:15PM JUDGE: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS - LYNDA BOOKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2014005065

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY) ASSESSED $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LYNDA BOOKER - ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/14/2014 CASE NUMBER 2014 CC 000175 SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONDER, CHANTEL