This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 16:25:10 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS AUGUSTE, YVES

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUGUSTE, YVES. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

AUGUSTE, YVES

North Port, FL 34288-8438

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, SHAYNA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/9/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

8/9/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

8/9/2022: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

8/9/2022: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022070740

8/9/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022070740

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - YVES AUGUSTE

8/11/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - YVES AUGUSTE

SUMMONS SERVED - YVES AUGUSTE

8/16/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - YVES AUGUSTE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/31/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT

9/1/2022: ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM E; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - YVES AUGUSTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - YVES AUGUSTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/31/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN E , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022070740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAYNA L SINGER, ESQ