This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/02/2023 at 18:04:02 (UTC).

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC Et Al VS STILES, KIM I

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STILES, KIM I. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SHOREPOINT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE

PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC

Defendant

STILES, KIM I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/1/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

2/1/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KIM I STILES- ISSUED 02/01/2023

2/1/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KIM I STILES- ISSUED 02/01/2023

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/1/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023010035

2/1/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023010035

SUMMONS SERVED - KIM I STILES

2/14/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - KIM I STILES

RESPONSE

3/2/2023: RESPONSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - KIM I STILES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $710.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - CTY >$15,000<=$30,000; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023010035

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KIM I STILES- ISSUED 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less