This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 00:35:42 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOLDMAN, JUDITH M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

MOGG, DANIELLA

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4/24/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE

4/10/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER SETTING TRIAL

3/2/2018: ORDER SETTING TRIAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/27/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CANCELLATION PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

2/19/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CANCELLATION PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

1/30/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

1/30/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2018007387

1/23/2018: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2018007387

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

1/23/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

1/23/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/23/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

1/23/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2018
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 04/24/2018 AT 10:30 AM IN 2B , JDG: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CANCELLATION PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2018007387

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 02/27/2018 AT 10:30 AM IN 2B , JDG: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less