This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 06:07:35 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

ZAYNE, CASSIE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM- PLAINTIFF

4/13/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM- PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1/5/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

8/31/2017: DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

8/29/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/22/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

8/18/2017: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE /MEDIATION

8/18/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE /MEDIATION

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

7/26/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

3/27/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

6/11/2018: ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY-AMENDED

12/13/2017: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY-AMENDED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/24/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICEOF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

8/24/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICEOF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/23/2017: PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

8/16/2017: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

7/26/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

7/26/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY-AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING OFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE /MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$90.00; Amount Paid:$90.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017071651

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/22/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

    Read MoreRead Less