This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 13:56:45 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2017 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

GOODE, JAIMEE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

4/12/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE - SERVING SETTLEMENT PROPOSAL

1/15/2018: NOTICE - SERVING SETTLEMENT PROPOSAL

MEMORANDUM - DISCOVERY REQUESTS & PRIVILEGED LOG

12/28/2017: MEMORANDUM - DISCOVERY REQUESTS & PRIVILEGED LOG

RESPONSES - TO PRODUCTION REQUEST

12/28/2017: RESPONSES - TO PRODUCTION REQUEST

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/28/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/28/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/21/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

10/20/2017: NOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

10/5/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/20/2018: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/29/2017: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/28/2017: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

ORDER-PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

11/22/2017: ORDER-PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - REQUEST CANCELLATION PRE-TRIAL - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - REQUEST CANCELLATION PRE-TRIAL - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017093990

10/5/2017: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017093990

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

10/5/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

10/5/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

10/5/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - EXECUTED JURAT PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING SETTLEMENT PROPOSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM - DISCOVERY REQUESTS & PRIVILEGED LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSES - TO PRODUCTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSES - TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - REQUEST CANCELLATION PRE-TRIAL - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$90.00; Amount Paid:$90.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2017093990

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 11/21/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $100 TO $500

    Read MoreRead Less