This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/09/2023 at 17:40:23 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOMPOTHECRAS, ALEX

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY- ISSUED 02/24/2023

2/23/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY- ISSUED 02/24/2023

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

2/23/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AND ATTORNEY

2/23/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AND ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/23/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/23/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

2/23/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017184

2/23/2023: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017184

SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

3/2/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017184

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AND ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY- ISSUED 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less