This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/07/2021 at 19:49:31 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORMAN, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

3/13/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM JESSE WESSELMAN TO CIVIL LAW DIVISION

2/9/2018: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM JESSE WESSELMAN TO CIVIL LAW DIVISION

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

1/29/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

1/23/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/5/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/6/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

6/6/2017: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (NOT ATTACHED)

5/24/2017: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (NOT ATTACHED)

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017038472

4/19/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017038472

SUMMONS ISSUED-PRORESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

4/19/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED-PRORESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

4/19/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/19/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

4/19/2017: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2018
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5C; Description:LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM JESSE WESSELMAN TO CIVIL LAW DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 03/13/2018 AT 11:00 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5C; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5C; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 07/05/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (NOT ATTACHED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017038472

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-PRORESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 06/06/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5C , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN THOMAS FORMAN