This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/24/2022 at 16:19:47 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILEV, GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

MOTION - PROHIBIT SPOILAGE OF EVIDENCE

8/8/2018: MOTION - PROHIBIT SPOILAGE OF EVIDENCE

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ARNP REDUCTION

2/27/2019: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ARNP REDUCTION

SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY-CFO OF FLORIDA

12/11/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY-CFO OF FLORIDA

NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

2/27/2019: NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - SUPPLEMENTAL

8/8/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - SUPPLEMENTAL

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

11/17/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/17/2018: MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017108021

11/17/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017108021

GEICO - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

1/19/2018: GEICO - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- VOLUNTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TAX ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - SUPPLEMENTAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY-CFO OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE.MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017108021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY-GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 12/27/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hoffman, Stephanie Spaulding