This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 17:39:23 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

SALOMON, GIBELLE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

2/24/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

2/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

2/24/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

2/24/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017787

2/24/2023: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017787

SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

3/2/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

3/7/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017787

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - ISSUED 2/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less