*************0 NC
02/24/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Sarasota, Florida
QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.
PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC
GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
MAYNARD, MARK
SALOMON, GIBELLE
2/24/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
2/24/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00
2/24/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
2/24/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
2/24/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
2/24/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM
2/24/2023: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017787
3/2/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
3/7/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS
DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS SERVED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
[-] Read LessFinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00
[-] Read LessFinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00
[-] Read LessDocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023017787
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT, CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND PIP ADDENDUM
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
[-] Read LessDocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00
[-] Read LessDocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - ISSUED 2/28/2023
[-] Read Less