This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 11:00:34 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORMAN, BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

SALOMON, GIBELLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

5/14/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

12/21/2018: NOTICE - DISCLOSURE

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/21/2018: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/10/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/10/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

12/10/2018: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

12/6/2018: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/5/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/27/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018115531

11/16/2018: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018115531

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

11/16/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

11/16/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/16/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

11/16/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018115531

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 11/27/2018 AT 10:30 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less