This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 18:37:05 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENGELBRECHT, CHASE

 

Court Documents

REQUEST - FOR ISSUANCE

6/30/2022: REQUEST - FOR ISSUANCE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

6/30/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

6/30/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

6/30/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/30/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

6/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022058543

6/30/2022: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022058543

SUMMONS SERVED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

7/5/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $65.00; Amount Paid: $65.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00; Total Fee: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022058543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/09/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - FOR ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENGELBRECHT, CHASE