This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/08/2021 at 09:05:15 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

MCFARLANE, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

12/17/2018: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

10/19/2017: NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

7/6/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF CONFLICT AND/OR UNAVAILABILITY

6/15/2017: NOTICE OF CONFLICT AND/OR UNAVAILABILITY

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

6/6/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/6/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT THE 04/08/17 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TO ENTER STANDARD PERSONAL INJURY PROTECTION (PIP) PRETRIAL ORDER

4/20/2017: ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT THE 04/08/17 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TO ENTER STANDARD PERSONAL INJURY PROTECTION (PIP) PRETRIAL ORDER

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM WILLIAM J. MCFARLANE, III

4/20/2017: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM WILLIAM J. MCFARLANE, III

SUMMONS SERVED - CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

4/12/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

7/12/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

6/6/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND COMPLY WITH THE APRIL 19, 2017 COURT ORDER

5/10/2017: AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND COMPLY WITH THE APRIL 19, 2017 COURT ORDER

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND COMPLY WITH THE APRIL 19, 2017 COURT ORDER

5/8/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND COMPLY WITH THE APRIL 19, 2017 COURT ORDER

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

4/13/2017: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017028489

3/22/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017028489

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 03/22/2017

3/22/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 03/22/2017

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

3/22/2017: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

3/22/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFLICT AND/OR UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT CENTURY-NATIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017028489

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 04/18/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 7B , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CENTURY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 03/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less