This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 18:14:36 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

KHUTORSKY, GARY I

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/8/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12/8/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

12/8/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

12/8/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2021103781

12/8/2021: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2021103781

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED - ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/27/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

1/20/2022: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

1/20/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1/20/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

1/20/2022: ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

2/1/2022: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 01/18/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2021103781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATLANTIC CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Khutorsky