This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 10:55:51 (UTC).

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHYSICIANS GROUP LLC

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYNARD, MARK

Defendant Attorney

PARRINO, ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

2/21/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/13/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE - REQUEST TO PRODUCE

6/5/2018: RESPONSE - REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

5/2/2018: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION EMAIL

4/27/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION EMAIL

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

4/3/2018: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

3/21/2018: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

3/21/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- WITH PREJUDICE VOLUNTARY

7/10/2019: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL- WITH PREJUDICE VOLUNTARY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/22/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

6/19/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/5/2018: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

5/25/2018: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

5/2/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

5/2/2018: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/1/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENTPIP CASE MANAGEMENT

5/1/2018: ORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENTPIP CASE MANAGEMENT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL- WITH PREJUDICE VOLUNTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PIP CASE MANAGEMENTPIP CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/CANCELLATION SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - SUMMONS SERVED - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2018029780

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY- ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/01/2018 AT 10:30 AM IN 5B , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less