This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/05/2021 at 18:09:53 (UTC).

PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC VS DEGIROLAMO, MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEGIROLAMO, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC

Defendants

THE PUBLIC HOUSE TAP & GRILL INC

DEGIROLAMO, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCADIS, RALPH SAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - THE PUBLIC HOUSE TAP & GRILL LLC

7/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - THE PUBLIC HOUSE TAP & GRILL LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MICHAEL DEGIROLAMO

7/9/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MICHAEL DEGIROLAMO

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

7/7/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021057921

7/7/2021: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021057921

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

7/6/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

7/6/2021: NOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

7/6/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

7/6/2021: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/6/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

9/1/2021: NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

8/31/2021: AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT

8/31/2021: AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT - PROOF OF COSTS

8/31/2021: AFFIDAVIT - PROOF OF COSTS

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

8/30/2021: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

ORDER - DEFAULT

8/26/2021: ORDER - DEFAULT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/24/2021: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS SERVED - MICHAEL DEGIROLAMO

7/22/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - MICHAEL DEGIROLAMO

SUMMONS SERVED- THE PUBLIC HOUSE TAP AND GRILL LLC C/O SCALERA GEOFF R.A. OR ANY OFFICER OR DIRECTOR AT

7/15/2021: SUMMONS SERVED- THE PUBLIC HOUSE TAP AND GRILL LLC C/O SCALERA GEOFF R.A. OR ANY OFFICER OR DIRECTOR AT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Sep 24 2021 9:00AM JUDGE: MOSS, DANA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - CALCULATION OF INTREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - PROOF OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - MICHAEL DEGIROLAMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/24/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021057921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE-CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - THE PUBLIC HOUSE TAP & GRILL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - MICHAEL DEGIROLAMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERFORMANCE FOOD GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcadis, Ralph S