Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 20:59:11 (UTC).

PAULSEN SR, DONALD B Et Al VS FLEET DRIVERS INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2017 PAULSEN SR, DONALD B filed an Other lawsuit against FLEET DRIVERS INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCHUGH, ANDREA and CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCHUGH, ANDREA

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAULSEN SR, DONALD B

PAULSEN, NANCY E

Defendants

MILLER, GARY DEAN

THE SCHOOL BOARD OF SARASOTA COUNTY

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

FLEET DRIVERS INC

HOPKINS, MICHAEL ALAN

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACK, KERRY

Defendant Attorneys

HARDY, ARTHUR STEVEN

HARDY, ARTHUR

PEAIRS, JEFFREY

SASTRE, MICHAEL

BARRY, RICHARD

EPSTEIN, AARON

SEITZ, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

ORDER - RECUSAL

1/5/2021: ORDER - RECUSAL

ORDER - GRANTING SUBSITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO UPDATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

11/13/2020: ORDER - GRANTING SUBSITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO UPDATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON-PARTIES

11/6/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON-PARTIES

MOTION - COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

10/27/2020: MOTION - COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

ANSWER - AMENDED - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - MICHAEL ALAN HOPKINS AND FLEET DRIVERS INC

10/7/2020: ANSWER - AMENDED - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - MICHAEL ALAN HOPKINS AND FLEET DRIVERS INC

ORDER - ON MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/18/2020: ORDER - ON MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ORDER - DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/18/2020: ORDER - DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/25/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AS TO LIABILITY

8/18/2020: RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AS TO LIABILITY

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SARASOTA COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD- ISSUED 2/24/2017

2/24/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SARASOTA COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD- ISSUED 2/24/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HERTZ VEHICLES LLC - ISSUED 02/24/2017

2/24/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HERTZ VEHICLES LLC - ISSUED 02/24/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FLEET DRIVERS INC - ISSUED 02/24/2017

2/24/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FLEET DRIVERS INC - ISSUED 02/24/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -ISSUED 02/24/2017

2/24/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -ISSUED 02/24/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL ALAN HOPKINS - ISSUED 02/24/2017

2/24/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL ALAN HOPKINS - ISSUED 02/24/2017

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GARY DEAN MILLER - ISSUED 02/24/2017

2/24/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GARY DEAN MILLER - ISSUED 02/24/2017

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - SARASOTA COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE OF COMPLAINT

2/24/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - SARASOTA COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE OF COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/24/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/24/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

389 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - RECUSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING SUBSITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND DIRECTING THE CLERK OF COURT TO UPDATE THE CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - AMENDED - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - MICHAEL ALAN HOPKINS AND FLEET DRIVERS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • HearingTime:02:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AS TO LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
393 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017019095

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SARASOTA COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD- ISSUED 2/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HERTZ VEHICLES LLC - ISSUED 02/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FLEET DRIVERS INC - ISSUED 02/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -ISSUED 02/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL ALAN HOPKINS - ISSUED 02/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - GARY DEAN MILLER - ISSUED 02/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - SARASOTA COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD - UNABLE TO ISSUE - DOES NOT MATCH CASE STYLE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE SCHOOL BOARD OF SARASOTA COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACK, KERRY