This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/15/2020 at 20:05:33 (UTC).

PATTERSON, ALEXIS CHER CARLSON VS PATTERSON, MICHAEL KIRK

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 PATTERSON, ALEXIS CHER CARLSON filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PATTERSON, MICHAEL KIRK. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, DON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PATTERSON, ALEXIS CHER CARLSON

Respondent

PATTERSON, MICHAEL KIRK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

STICKLEY, ALBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - ORDER AMENDED THE AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION - SERVED - MICHAEL PATTERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketACTION: SERVICE PACKET TO SSO - AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketORDER - ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC FROM SARASOTA THERAPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC FROM SARASOTA THERAPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketORDER AMENDED (PERMANENT) INJUNCTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018012509)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED - STEVE BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE - INTENTION TO OFFER EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCHECKLIST INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION -SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketWAIVER -PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE - INFORMATION FOR RESPONDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNOTICE -ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE RELATIONSHIP FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less