Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 17:08:32 (UTC).

PATRICIA LYNCH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS FRISCHMANN VS CARDIAC SUPPORT SPECIALTIES LLC A/K/A CSS Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2017 PATRICIA LYNCH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS FRISCHMANN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CARDIAC SUPPORT SPECIALTIES LLC A/K/A CSS. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA LYNCH AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS FRISCHMANN

Defendants

DAYO III MD, MATEO B

VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ASSOCIATES PLLC

OCALA HEART INSTITUTE INC

VENICE HMA LLC DBA VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER AKA VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH

CARDIAC SUPPORT SPECIALTIES LLC A/K/A CSS

VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES PLLC

TYRRELL, DANIEL A

CARDIOVASCULAR INSIGHTS LLC A/K/A CVI

STEPHANIE LIVINGSTON PA C

DRIER MD, JONATHAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCARDLE, PATRICK

Defendant Attorneys

BRUMBY, CARISSA

HOUSTON, A

LUMPKIN, DOUGLAS

MARCHBANK, RALPH

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM DICKINSON & GIBBONS PA

6/11/2019: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM DICKINSON & GIBBONS PA

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FINAL - AS TO DEFENDANTS - JONATHAN DAVID DREIER MD AND VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES PLLC - AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE FILE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019077821)

6/11/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FINAL - AS TO DEFENDANTS - JONATHAN DAVID DREIER MD AND VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES PLLC - AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE FILE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019077821)

ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FINAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019077788)

6/11/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - FINAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019077788)

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM A KEVIN HOUSTON

6/6/2019: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM A KEVIN HOUSTON

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - AS TO VENICE HMA LLC DBA VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH FKA VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

6/6/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - AS TO VENICE HMA LLC DBA VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH FKA VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

STIPULATION - FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

5/28/2019: STIPULATION - FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM MINDY MCLAUGHLIN

5/24/2019: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM MINDY MCLAUGHLIN

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019069575)

5/24/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019069575)

STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, VENICE HMA, LLC D/B/A VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH F/K/A VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

5/22/2019: STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, VENICE HMA, LLC D/B/A VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH F/K/A VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CARDIOVASCULAR INSIGHTS LLC AKA CVI AND CARDIAC SUPPORT SPECIALITIES LLC AKA CSS - UNABLE TO ISSUE TWO PARTIES ON ONE SUMMONS

3/1/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - CARDIOVASCULAR INSIGHTS LLC AKA CVI AND CARDIAC SUPPORT SPECIALITIES LLC AKA CSS - UNABLE TO ISSUE TWO PARTIES ON ONE SUMMONS

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES PLLC- ISSUED 3/1/2017

3/1/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES PLLC- ISSUED 3/1/2017

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - JONATHAN DAVID DREIER MD - UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

3/1/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - JONATHAN DAVID DREIER MD - UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - - VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH FKA VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER- ISSUED 3/1/2017

3/1/2017: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - - VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH FKA VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER- ISSUED 3/1/2017

PAYMENT $12.50 RECEIPT #2017017180

2/21/2017: PAYMENT $12.50 RECEIPT #2017017180

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

2/15/2017: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017015047

2/14/2017: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017015047

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/14/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

2/14/2017: PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

218 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM DICKINSON & GIBBONS PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - FINAL - AS TO DEFENDANTS - JONATHAN DAVID DREIER MD AND VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES PLLC - AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE FILE - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019077821)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL - FINAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019077788)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM A KEVIN HOUSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - AS TO VENICE HMA LLC DBA VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH FKA VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM MINDY MCLAUGHLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019069575)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, VENICE HMA, LLC D/B/A VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH F/K/A VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - CARDIOVASCULAR INSIGHTS LLC AKA CVI AND CARDIAC SUPPORT SPECIALITIES LLC AKA CSS - UNABLE TO ISSUE TWO PARTIES ON ONE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VENICE CARDIOVASCULAR ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES PLLC- ISSUED 3/1/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - JONATHAN DAVID DREIER MD - UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - - VENICE REGIONAL BAYFRONT HEALTH FKA VENICE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER- ISSUED 3/1/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $12.50 RECEIPT #2017017180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$542.50; Amount Paid:$542.50; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017015047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENICE HMA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATRICK MCARDLE