This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 18:07:51 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL LLC VS DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 PATH MEDICAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATH MEDICAL LLC

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIAPPETTA, NICHOLAS

Defendant Attorney

MCFARLANE, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/10/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1/10/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/13/2022

1/10/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/13/2022

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023002889

1/10/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023002889

SUMMONS SERVED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

1/17/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2/1/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION - FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: MOTION - FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

MOTION - DEFAULT

2/7/2023: MOTION - DEFAULT

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

2/8/2023: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/9/2023: RESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE - SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

2/14/2023: NOTICE - SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/14/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/14/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/14/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/14/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023002889

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less