This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 18:07:38 (UTC).

PATH MEDICAL LLC VS DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 PATH MEDICAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATH MEDICAL LLC

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIAPPETTA, NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/10/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

1/10/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/13/2022

1/10/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/13/2022

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023002887

1/10/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023002887

SUMMONS SERVED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

1/17/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

2/7/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

DEFAULT - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

2/8/2023: DEFAULT - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketDOCKETED IN ERROR - FORM GENERATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023002887

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 1/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less