This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 17:19:02 (UTC).

PAGE, JAMES RAY VS ANDERSON, SARAH M Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2018 PAGE, JAMES RAY filed an Other lawsuit against ANDERSON, SARAH M. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA and WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAGE, JAMES RAY

Defendants

RICHARD R GANS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF JANET E MORGAN

WALTERS, COURTNEY B

ANDERSON, SARAH M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MYERS, JOHN

Defendant Attorney

MAGLICH, DAVID STEPHAN

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION - TO NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/20/2019: OBJECTION - TO NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - MICHAEL ARMEY

6/19/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - MICHAEL ARMEY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

6/18/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/10/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION - DISMISS PETITION TO VALIDATE CLAIM

8/16/2018: MOTION - DISMISS PETITION TO VALIDATE CLAIM

OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE

7/3/2018: OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE

MOTION - DISMISS OR IN ALTERNATIVE TO STRIKE

6/4/2018: MOTION - DISMISS OR IN ALTERNATIVE TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

6/4/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018048884

5/10/2018: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018048884

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SARAH M ANDERSON - ISSUED 05/10/2018

5/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SARAH M ANDERSON - ISSUED 05/10/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COURTNEY B WALTERS - ISSUED 05/10/2018

5/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COURTNEY B WALTERS - ISSUED 05/10/2018

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RICHARD R GANS - ISSUED 05/10/2018

5/8/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RICHARD R GANS - ISSUED 05/10/2018

COMPLAINT

5/8/2018: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/8/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/8/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION - TO NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - MICHAEL ARMEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS PETITION TO VALIDATE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISMISS OR IN ALTERNATIVE TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$430.00; Amount Paid:$430.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018048884

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SARAH M ANDERSON - ISSUED 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COURTNEY B WALTERS - ISSUED 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - RICHARD R GANS - ISSUED 05/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less