This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/16/2020 at 01:23:56 (UTC).

PAEZ, NIKKO VS GORDON, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 PAEZ, NIKKO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GORDON, SANDRA. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON and RUHL, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON

RUHL, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAEZ, NIKKO

Respondent

GORDON, SANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - PRO SE CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FORM A - SANDRA GORDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketANSWER - RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - FINANCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - SANDRA GORDON

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FORM A - NIKKO PAEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - RESPONDENT - COMPLAINT TO DETERMINE PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - PETITIONER - COMPLAINT TO DETERMINE PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - LIMITATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - UCCJEA - SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY, VISITATION, AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketMOTION - FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018009301

    Read MoreRead Less