This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/13/2022 at 01:24:20 (UTC).

OVERHOLSER, ALICIA M VS THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 OVERHOLSER, ALICIA M filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OVERHOLSER, ALICIA M

Defendants

TRUKA, DIANNE FORTUNE

THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAINZ, R

Defendant Attorney

MARINO, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

6/17/2022: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 6/17/2022

6/17/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 6/17/2022

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022054472

6/17/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022054472

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

6/21/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DIANNE FORTUNE TRUKA - ISSUED 6/17/2022

6/17/2022: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DIANNE FORTUNE TRUKA - ISSUED 6/17/2022

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

6/17/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

8/9/2022: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

8/8/2022: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - ADDRESSES

7/28/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS SERVED - DIANNE FORTUNE TRUKA

7/25/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - DIANNE FORTUNE TRUKA

SUMMONS SERVED - CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

7/25/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE - COMPLIANCE

7/19/2022: NOTICE - COMPLIANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/19/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

7/19/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

INTERROGATORIES

7/19/2022: INTERROGATORIES

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DIANNE FORTUNE TRUKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - AND NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022054472

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY - ISSUED 6/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DIANNE FORTUNE TRUKA - ISSUED 6/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNIFER MARINO