This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/18/2023 at 05:21:21 (UTC).

OSBORN, JEANNE L VS HARWOOD, JUDITH Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 OSBORN, JEANNE L filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARWOOD, JUDITH. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSBORN, JEANNE L

Defendants

LINDSAY LEASING LLC

RAWLINGS, SUSAN

HARWOOD, JUDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WONDER, CHANTEL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LINDSAY LEASING LLC - SENT WITH $40.00 CHECK #4851 TO SSO CIVIL

3/25/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LINDSAY LEASING LLC - SENT WITH $40.00 CHECK #4851 TO SSO CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - SUSAN RAWLINGS - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

3/25/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - SUSAN RAWLINGS - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - JUDITH HARWOOD - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

3/25/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - JUDITH HARWOOD - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

3/25/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

PAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2022027344

3/25/2022: PAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2022027344

SUMMONS SERVED - MARL LINDSAY - LINDSAY LEASING LLC

4/1/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - MARL LINDSAY - LINDSAY LEASING LLC

SUMMONS SERVED - JUDITH HARWOOD

4/11/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - JUDITH HARWOOD

SUMMONS SERVED - SUSAN RAWLINGS

4/11/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - SUSAN RAWLINGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

4/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

MOTION - TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE OR TO APPEAR BY PHONE OR VIDEO FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

4/21/2022: MOTION - TO RESET PRETRIAL CONFERENCE OR TO APPEAR BY PHONE OR VIDEO FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SETTING

4/29/2022: ORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SETTING

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM MARIA GOMEZ-PAULEY, LEGAL ASSISTANT

4/29/2022: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM MARIA GOMEZ-PAULEY, LEGAL ASSISTANT

NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

5/2/2022: NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

5/4/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

MAIL RETURNED - LINDSAY LEASING LLC

5/23/2022: MAIL RETURNED - LINDSAY LEASING LLC

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

5/25/2022: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/31/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS; Court Result: CANC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED - LINDSAY LEASING LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/31/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM MARIA GOMEZ-PAULEY, LEGAL ASSISTANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - SETTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $330.00; Amount Paid: $330.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS IN EXCESS OF FIVE @ $2.50 PER DEFENDANT; Total Fee: $0.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY; Total Fee: $30.00; Amount Paid: $30.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2022027344

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - JUDITH HARWOOD - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - SUSAN RAWLINGS - HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - LINDSAY LEASING LLC - SENT WITH $40.00 CHECK #4851 TO SSO CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/03/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less