Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/09/2021 at 00:38:24 (UTC).

OCALLAGHAN, JOHN, OCALLAGHAN, JOHN NICHOLAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 OCALLAGHAN, JOHN, OCALLAGHAN, JOHN NICHOLAS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Decedents

OCALLAGHAN, JOHN NICHOLAS

OCALLAGHAN, JOHN NICHOLAS JUDE JOSEPH

OCALLAGHAN, JOHN

Applicant

SWINDELL, PAULINE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RIDDELL, CYNTHIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY - NO FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - 12/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020146025)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketWILL ADMITTED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020141129)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketACTION: PROPOSED ORDER FORWARDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketORDER - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketPETITION - AMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$400.00; Amount Paid:$400.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020078516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketWILL- ORIGINAL PAPER-FILED SCANNED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (SILENT AS TO DATE OF WILL, SILENT AS TO ADMITTANCE OF WILL)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDDELL, CYNTHIA