This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 18:41:27 (UTC).

NEW REZ LLC F/K/A NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING VS HASKINS, JACKSON P Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 NEW REZ LLC F/K/A NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HASKINS, JACKSON P. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEW REZ LLC F/K/A NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC D/B/A SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

MEDALLION BANK

HASKINS, JACKSON P

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACKSON P HASKINS

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

PALMER LAKE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VANHOOK, NICHOLAS

LAWSON, RYAN

Defendant Attorneys

MAGINNESS, DERRICK

HOAG, BRIAN

GUGINO, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

ORDER RELEASING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

7/2/2019: ORDER RELEASING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

MOTION - TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

6/28/2019: MOTION - TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED

6/28/2019: DISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED

FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

5/13/2019: FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED

NOTICE OF FILING - COPY WARRANTY DEED AND FINANCING STATEMENT

3/20/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - COPY WARRANTY DEED AND FINANCING STATEMENT

AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY'S FEES, REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEY'S TIME - COSTS

9/21/2018: AFFIDAVIT - ATTORNEY'S FEES, REASONABLENESS OF ATTORNEY'S TIME - COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF - NOT ATTACHED

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF - NOT ATTACHED

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - MEDALLION BANK

6/13/2018: ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - MEDALLION BANK

SUMMONS SERVED - MEDALLION BANK

6/10/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - MEDALLION BANK

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

5/13/2019: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

3/28/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

MOTION - COMPEL

3/1/2019: MOTION - COMPEL

NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE (ORIGINALS)

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE (ORIGINALS)

MOTION - SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

9/21/2018: MOTION - SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

6/18/2018: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

6/6/2018: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS SERVED - PALMER LAKE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

6/6/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - PALMER LAKE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 05/23/2018

5/22/2018: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 05/23/2018

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW AND JUDICIAL RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RELEASING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION - OF FIRM ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • HearingTime:11:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 - ISSUED 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PALMER LAKE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JACKSON P HASKINS - ISSUED 05/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018068865)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less