This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 12/20/2021 at 18:00:21 (UTC).

NESPOR, DEBRA VS FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 NESPOR, DEBRA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NESPOR, DEBRA

Defendants

TB MALL AT UTC LLC

THE MALL AT UNIVERSITY TOWN CENTER

FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALAIMO, MARIA

Defendant Attorney

METZLER, DEBRA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/20/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TB MALL AT UTC LLC DBA THE MALL AT UNIVERSITY TOWN CENTER

10/20/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TB MALL AT UTC LLC DBA THE MALL AT UNIVERSITY TOWN CENTER

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICE INC

10/20/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICE INC

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/20/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

10/20/2021: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/20/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/20/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/20/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

10/20/2021: NOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021090006

10/21/2021: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021090006

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

10/28/2021: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12/13/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS SERVED - TB MALL AT UTC LLC D/B/A THE MALL AT UNIVERSITY TOWN CENTER

12/14/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - TB MALL AT UTC LLC D/B/A THE MALL AT UNIVERSITY TOWN CENTER

SUMMONS SERVED - FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC

12/14/2021: SUMMONS SERVED - FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - TB MALL AT UTC LLC D/B/A THE MALL AT UNIVERSITY TOWN CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 03/21/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021090006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICE INC - ISSUED 10/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- TB MALL AT UTC LLC DBA THE MALL AT UNIVERSITY TOWN CENTER - ISSUED 10/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TB MALL AT UTC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer METZLER , DEBRA M