This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/28/2023 at 01:02:36 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS ISLANDER CLUB OF LONGBOAT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ISLANDER CLUB OF LONGBOAT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 SC

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

ZAMBERLETTI, VALERIE M

VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRUSTEE OF THE VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRUST UTD MARCH 8 2017

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA

ISLANDER CLUB OF LONGBOAT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN

Defendant Attorneys

EDWARDS, SHEREE

MARTIN, KARI

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME EFFORT AND COSTS

4/13/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME EFFORT AND COSTS

CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

3/31/2023: CERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

ORDER - SHOW CAUSE

3/27/2023: ORDER - SHOW CAUSE

ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT OF FORECLOSURE - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

3/27/2023: ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT OF FORECLOSURE - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

MOTION - FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

3/17/2023: MOTION - FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI - RECORDED (OR. / 2023041304)

3/14/2023: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI - RECORDED (OR. / 2023041304)

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI

3/13/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI

3/13/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI

SUMMONS SERVED - VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRUSTEE

3/13/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRUSTEE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4/26/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

RESPONSE

4/25/2023: RESPONSE

CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - MARCIELA TRAMBLE

4/14/2023: CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - MARCIELA TRAMBLE

NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE & ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

4/14/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE & ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI

3/17/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI

SUMMONS SERVED - VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRISTEE OF THE VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRUST UTD MARCH 8 2017

3/17/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRISTEE OF THE VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRUST UTD MARCH 8 2017

SUMMONS SERVED - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

3/17/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

SUMMONS SERVED - ISLANDER CLUB OF LONGBOAT CONDOMINIUM INC

3/17/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - ISLANDER CLUB OF LONGBOAT CONDOMINIUM INC

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:00 PM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - MARCIELA TRAMBLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE & ORIGINAL MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT AS TO TIME EFFORT AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - SERVICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - TO COMPLAINT OF FORECLOSURE - JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRISTEE OF THE VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI TRUST UTD MARCH 8 2017 - ISSUED 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI - ISSUED 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VALERIE M ZAMBERLETTI - ISSUED 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA - ISSUED 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ISLANDER CLUB OF LONGBOAT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 2/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023028514)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less