This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/02/2021 at 12:50:18 (UTC).

NATIONAL HAIR CENTER INC VS ANDRISIUNAS, BIRUTE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2014 NATIONAL HAIR CENTER INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDRISIUNAS, BIRUTE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL HAIR CENTER INC

Defendants

HAIR KINGDOM LLC

ANDRISIUNAS, BIRUTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INVERSO, DARREN

Defendant Attorneys

SAUNDERS, JONATHAN

GYDEN, HENRY GEROME

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO COMPEL

4/6/2015: MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

9/8/2015: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

11/6/2014: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/17/2014: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER FLA.R.CIV.P.1.420(E)

5/15/2017: MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER FLA.R.CIV.P.1.420(E)

ANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES

9/24/2014: ANSWER AND AFFIMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

1/8/2015: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/6/2014: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING

10/21/2014: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2017
  • HearingTime:09:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017104976)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Aug 18 2017 9:30AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER FLA.R.CIV.P.1.420(E)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • HearingTime:02:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (NORTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO RENEWED AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - EVIDENTIARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (NORTH COUNTY) DATE: Sep 9 2015 2:30PM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2014
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (NORTH COUNTY) DATE: Oct 2 2014 2:30PM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BIRUTE ANDRISIUNAS INDIVIDUALLY - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO RICHARD ANDRISLUNAS AS HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - HAIR KINGDOM LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY - CORPORATE SERVICE TO RICHARD ANDRISLUNAS AS HUSBAND TO REGISTERED AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$420.00; Amount Paid:$420.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2014092369

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HAIR KINGDOM LLC - ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BIRUTE ANDRISIUNAS - ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer INVERSO, DARREN