This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/19/2022 at 02:46:04 (UTC).

MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC VS CUNNINGHAM II, TRUSTEE, WILLIAM CHALFANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against CUNNINGHAM II, TRUSTEE, WILLIAM CHALFANT. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCHUGH, ANDREA and BRUNING, KEVIN R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRUNING, KEVIN R

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

CUNNINGHAM II, TRUSTEE, WILLIAM CHALFANT

CUNNINGHAM, TRUSTEE, KAREN JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURGESS, JAMES H JR

Defendant Attorney

O'NEAL, FREDERIC BENNETT

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II AND KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

5/9/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II AND KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY - COUNSEL

5/24/2022: NOTICE - UNAVAILABILITY - COUNSEL

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

7/26/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

MEMORANDUM - OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE PORTAINS OF THE COUNTERCLAIM

7/19/2022: MEMORANDUM - OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE PORTAINS OF THE COUNTERCLAIM

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

6/23/2022: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

6/21/2022: REPORT - CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

6/16/2022: ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/13/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

OBJECTION

6/3/2022: OBJECTION

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: NON-JURY TRIAL - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingTime: 08:45 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: MANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT; Court Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL - CIVIL SET FOR 12/05/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 6C , JDG: BRUNING, KEVIN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY DOCKET SOUNDING SET FOR 11/28/2022 AT 8:45 AM IN 6C , JDG: BRUNING, KEVIN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - WITNESS AND EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIST - WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ON MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TRANSFER ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II AND KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022034008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/17/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2022031040

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. CUNNINGHAM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREDERIC O'NEAL