This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 06/04/2022 at 18:27:07 (UTC).

MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC VS CUNNINGHAM II, TRUSTEE, WILLIAM CHALFANT Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CUNNINGHAM II, TRUSTEE, WILLIAM CHALFANT. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

CUNNINGHAM II, TRUSTEE, WILLIAM CHALFANT

CUNNINGHAM, TRUSTEE, KAREN JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURGESS, JAMES H JR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/5/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

4/5/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

PAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2022031040

4/5/2022: PAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2022031040

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II TRUSTEE

4/8/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II TRUSTEE

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM TRUSTEE

4/8/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM TRUSTEE

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

4/8/2022: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022034008

4/14/2022: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022034008

COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II AND KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

5/9/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II AND KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

MOTION - TRANSFER ACTION

5/9/2022: MOTION - TRANSFER ACTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/9/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022042174

5/10/2022: PAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022042174

SUMMONS NON SERVED - KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

5/16/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

SUMMONS NON SERVED - WILLLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM

5/16/2022: SUMMONS NON SERVED - WILLLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

5/17/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

5/17/2022: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

5/17/2022: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO 2022 CA 002348 NC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - WILLLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $295.00 RECEIPT #2022042174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TRANSFER ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTER - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II AND KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2022034008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - KAREN JANE CUNNINGHAM TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM CHALFANT CUNNINGHAM II TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 05/17/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2 , JDG: QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$490.00; Amount Paid:$490.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2022031040

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - $500 TO $2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYAKKA VALLEY RANCHES IMPROVEMENT ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. CUNNINGHAM is a litigant