This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/06/2023 at 01:14:28 (UTC).

M&T BANK VS The Secretary of Housing and Urban Devel Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 M T BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Secretary of Housing and Urban Devel. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&T BANK

Defendants

The Secretary of Housing and Urban Devel

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OBO THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 2 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEKL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 1 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEKL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 3 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 4 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER, KATHRYN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - DISCHARGE AND ACCEPTING REPORT AD LITEM

3/16/2023: ORDER - DISCHARGE AND ACCEPTING REPORT AD LITEM

ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT - THE UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON

3/8/2023: ANSWER - TO COMPLAINT - THE UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON

MOTION - FOR DISCHARGE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

3/15/2023: MOTION - FOR DISCHARGE AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OBO THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPEMENT

2/15/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OBO THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPEMENT

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

2/15/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

2/15/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

DISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL - OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

2/14/2023: DISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL - OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

ORDER - APPOINTING ATTORNEY GUARDAIAN AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

2/7/2023: ORDER - APPOINTING ATTORNEY GUARDAIAN AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/6/2023: ORDER - STREAMLINED CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CERTIFICATE- OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

4/21/2023: CERTIFICATE- OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION

4/18/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

4/18/2023: NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE - AND DILIGENT SEARCH

4/18/2023: AFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE - AND DILIGENT SEARCH

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 1 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

4/13/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 1 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 2 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

4/13/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 2 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON ET AL

4/13/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON ET AL

NOTICE - SERVING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/10/2023: NOTICE - SERVING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 3 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

3/27/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 3 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE- OF MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketACTION:NOTICE OF ACTION SENT TO NEWSPAPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE - AND DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 1 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 2 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON A/K/A MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON ET AL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 4 OF THE ESTATE OF MICAHEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED - ISSUED 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 3 OF THE ESTATE OF MICAHEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED - ISSUED 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 2 OF THE ESTATE OF MICAHEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED - ISSUED 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN HEIR BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 1 OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON DECEASED - ISSUED 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF MICHAEL D JACKSON AKA MICHAEL DAVID JACKSON - ISSUED 2/1/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023016199)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less