This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/08/2021 at 21:33:09 (UTC).

MRI ASSOCIATES OF TAMPA INC Et Al VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MRI ASSOCIATES OF TAMPA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MRI ASSOCIATES OF TAMPA INC

PARK PLACE MRI

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORRICK, JOHN

Defendant Attorney

SALOMON, GIBELLE

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

12/12/2017: ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM BENJAMIN A KINCER

12/5/2017: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM BENJAMIN A KINCER

ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

12/5/2017: ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/22/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER - & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/24/2017: ANSWER - & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION - DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE

10/23/2017: MOTION - DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE

MOTION - STAY DISCOVERY

10/23/2017: MOTION - STAY DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/29/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8/25/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF HEARING - CROSS

11/16/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING - CROSS

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/30/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE - OF DISCLOSURE

10/24/2017: NOTICE - OF DISCLOSURE

MOTION - JUDICIAL DEFAULT

10/20/2017: MOTION - JUDICIAL DEFAULT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

9/27/2017: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/23/2017: PIP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

8/22/2017: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE /MEDIATION - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

8/4/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE /MEDIATION - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

7/12/2017: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2018
  • HearingTime:02:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • HearingTime:11:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 11 2018 2:30PM JUDGE: BOEHM, MARYANN LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketACTION: CASE TRANSFERRED TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER COVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM GIBELLE SALOMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM BENJAMIN A KINCER

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • HearingTime:10:30 AM; Location:COURTROOM 5B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE /MEDIATION - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$65.00; Amount Paid:$65.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017066901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 08/22/2017 AT 10:30 AM IN 5B , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNDER $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARK PLACE TX LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR JAVITZ, RUSSELL is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Salomon, Gibelle Graciela