This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/14/2023 at 18:03:44 (UTC).

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRA

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRA. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

BOBBY G CANNON A/K/A BOBBY CANNON A/K/A BOBBY G CANNON II AS PERS REP OF THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON

BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II

BOBBY G. CANNON II

BOBBY CANNON

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE NAMED INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON A/K/A CAROLINE ROSE CANNON (DECEASED)

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELANSON, KYLE

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE - OF MAILING

3/8/2023: CERTIFICATE - OF MAILING

MOTION - EXTENSION TIME

2/27/2023: MOTION - EXTENSION TIME

SUMMONS SERVED - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CNNON II AS PERS REP OF THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE K CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON ( DECEASED)

2/9/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CNNON II AS PERS REP OF THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE K CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON ( DECEASED)

SUMMONS SERVED - THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON ( DECEASED)

2/9/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON ( DECEASED)

SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

2/9/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS SERVED - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II

2/9/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II

DISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

2/8/2023: DISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

2/6/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

NOTICE - OF SERVING CASE MANAGEMENT

1/25/2023: NOTICE - OF SERVING CASE MANAGEMENT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 1/23/2023

1/13/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 1/23/2023

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 -ISSUED 1/23/2023

1/13/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 -ISSUED 1/23/2023

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II - ISSUED 1/23/2023

1/13/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II - ISSUED 1/23/2023

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II AS PERS REP OF THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON - ISSUED 1/23/2023

1/13/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II AS PERS REP OF THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON - ISSUED 1/23/2023

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON- ISSUED 1/23/2023

1/13/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON- ISSUED 1/23/2023

NOTICE - VALUE

1/13/2023: NOTICE - VALUE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1/13/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/13/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • HearingTime: 02:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 6C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE - OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CNNON II AS PERS REP OF THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE K CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON ( DECEASED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON ( DECEASED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMER - CONDITIONAL OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - ISSUED 1/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 -ISSUED 1/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II - ISSUED 1/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - BOBBY G CANNON AKA BOBBY CANNON AKA BOBBY G CANNON II AS PERS REP OF THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON - ISSUED 1/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THE ESTATE OF CAROLINE R CANNON AKA CAROLINE ROSE CANNON- ISSUED 1/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less