This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2020 at 09:27:59 (UTC).

MONTGOMERY, LINDA A VS MONTGOMERY, RYAN A

Case Summary

On 03/14/2018 MONTGOMERY, LINDA A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MONTGOMERY, RYAN A. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HALL, DON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MONTGOMERY, LINDA A

Respondent

MONTGOMERY, RYAN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • HearingTime:10:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING RETURNED - SERVED - RYAN A MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018036263)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketCHECKLIST INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING (SOUTH COUNTY) DATE: Mar 21 2018 10:15AM JUDGE: BONNER, KIMBERLY CARLTON LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketACTION: PETITIONER PACKET HAND DELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketACTION: SERVICE PACKET TO SSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketORDER - ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION - SSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION & NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketWAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - INFORMATION FOR RESPONDENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE - COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE RELATIONSHIP FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketPHYSICAL DESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less